VISION NORFOLK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Vision Norfolk we recognise that the experience of losing sight or developing vision impairment is extremely distressing and can be isolating and costly for those affected. Through our team of expert staff and volunteers, we offer a range of services that provide practical and emotional support to people with sight loss, their families and carers at every stage of their sight loss journey.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Norton | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
CLLR Nicole Caroline Karimi-Ghovanlou | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachael Laurie | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Jamie Kidd | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Bridget Hemmant | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr David Goldser MBBS | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Julian Foster MA,ACA,FCT | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY-SIGHTED PERSONS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RESIDENT IN NORWICH OR ELSEWHERE IN NORFOLK, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE BOARD THINKS FIT AND INCLUDING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOMES, HOSTELS OR HOUSING FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHERWISE; (B) THE PROVISION OF A VISITING SERVICE FOR PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE NOT RESIDENT IN ACCOMMODATION PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY AS AFORESAID; (C) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vision Norfolk
THE BRADBURY ACTIVITY CENTRE
BECKHAM PLACE
EDWARD STREET
NORWICH
NR3 3DZ
- Phone:
- 01603573000
- Email:
- office@visionnorfolk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.