Financial history THE HIGHBALL TRUST (BIRMINGHAM)

Charity number: 522861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £34.07k £39.84k £17.56k £21.35k £15.51k
Total expenditure £31.73k £31.12k £20.67k £30.98k £21.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £32.14k N/A N/A N/A