FANFARE MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 20 February 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Smith | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Giles Liddiard | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Andrew Donaldson Barlex | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jolly | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Imogen Allen | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Sonya Samantha Charlotte Ivy Jolly | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDING IN MILTON KEYNES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADMINISTERING A BURSARY FUND TO SUPPORT FAMILIES WITH FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO ACCESS MUSIC TUITION AT MILTON KEYNES MUSIC EDUCATION HUB.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE STABLES
POUND LANE
NORTH CRAWLEY
2 THE STABLES POUND LANE
MK16 9HL
- Phone:
- 01234391062
- Email:
- info@fanfare-mk.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window