MONEY ADVICE SOUTH TYNESIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to provide support of the relief of financial hardship in South Tyneside and neighbouring areas by providing a range of impartial money advice and support services to people in financial hardship, including those in debt, who though lack of means would be otherwise unable to obtain such advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 06 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lesley Jones | Chair | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Cowan | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Moody | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jamieson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Sheila Bamber | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SOUTH TYNESIDE AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS BY PROVIDING A RANGE OF IMPARTIAL MONEY ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, INCLUDING THOSE IN DEBT, WHO THROUGH LACK OF MEANS WOULD BE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Perth Green Community Association
Inverness Road
JARROW
Tyne And Wear
NE32 4AQ
- Phone:
- 07555406416
- Email:
- info@moneyadvicest.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window