Financial history BOLTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 523052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.05k £17.88k £75.74k £21.01k £15.34k
Total expenditure £5.75k £15.93k £104.92k £19.39k £8.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.33k £8.34k N/A £10.00k £4.00k