SYROS CATS UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of animal welfare in Greece, specifically for cats and other stray animals on the Cycladic Island of Syros; support charitable organisations on the Island of Syros which undertake the practical care of the animals in question; and the provision of educational projects to teach the importance of improving empathy and awareness of animal welfare in the wider community.
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Greece
Governance
- 22 February 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Elizabeth Woodward | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Storey | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
HANNA ROTH | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul McGlone | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS ON THE CYCLADIC ISLAND OF SYROS, GREECE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANIMAL RESCUE AND WELFARE ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT, SECURITY AND REHOMING SERVICES FOR ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Craignair Road
LONDON
SW2 2DG
- Phone:
- 07887726236
- Email:
- P.McGlone@Outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.