Financial history REETH DISTRICT MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 523402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.35k £17.83k £28.85k £32.48k £32.98k
Total expenditure £15.80k £17.47k £23.42k £25.13k £31.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £8.10k £3.89k £1.57k N/A