FULWOOD OLD CHAPEL (UNITARIAN)

Charity number: 1207656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Chapel promotes worship in accordance with the principles of the General Assembly of Unitarian and Free Christian Churches. In addition to regular worship, the Chapel provides a location for namings, weddings, funerals and memorial services, as well as a place where a variety of community groups can meet and community activities can take place.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £29,936
Total expenditure: £13,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 March 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • FULWOOD OLD CHAPEL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Moore Chair 24 November 2024
THE UNITY CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Sarah Welsh Trustee 24 November 2024
THE DERBYSHIRE ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Peter Rowson Trustee 24 November 2024
THE OLD CHAPEL (UNITARIAN), GREAT HUCKLOW
Received: On time
Roderick Cumming Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Anne Rayner Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Janet Rowson Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Caroline Thorpe Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Timothy Simkins Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Marie Fitzpatrick Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Robert Ince Trustee 24 November 2024
INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR RELIGIOUS FREEDOM
Received: On time
WILLIAM RONKSLEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF FULWOOD CHAPEL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2024
Total gross income £29.94k
Total expenditure £13.03k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8a WHITELEY LANE
SHEFFIELD
S10 4GL
Phone:
01142302656