Grotton and District Residents Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grotton Residents Association run and manage the community centre known as The Pavilion in the village of Grotton. We hold annual events including the Grotton Gala and bonfire night but mainly the centre is used by local groups and organisation including a , table tennis group, slimming group, bridge club, wine circle as well as childrens parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
- Oldham
Governance
- 14 September 1971: Standard registration
- GROTTON AND DISTRICT RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- GROTTON AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Louise Oldfield | Chair | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gordon Hewitt | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Karen Morgan | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ged Gibbons | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALICIA MARLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATH HODGES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS SUE HODGKISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | £1.42k | £6.39k | £12.96k | £10.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.27k | £3.24k | £14.51k | £8.64k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1965, AND DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1964 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
GROTTON, SPRINGHEAD, LYDGATE, GRASSCROFT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
Station Road
Grotton
OLDHAM
OL4 5SF
- Phone:
- 01616241905
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window