BENLLECH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 09 April 1963: Standard registration
- NEUADD GOFFA GORONWY OWEN MEMORIAL HALL-BENIIECH (Working name)
- THE GORONWY OWEN MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Harker-Roberts | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dafydd Humphreys | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ieuan Williams | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Neil Lynch | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Katy Lyn Smith | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Richardson | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Delia Rowlands | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Eira Parry | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Hulme | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD BRYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN FARNSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £675 | £1.35k | £5.35k | £5.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £2.30k | £1.24k | £5.31k | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 DECEMBER 1962
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BENLLECH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BENLLECH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neuadd Goronwy
Ffordd Llangefni
Tyn-y-Gongl
LL74 8SF
- Phone:
- 01248853682
- Email:
- neuaddgoronwy@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window