MALTBY COLLIERY INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting and recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rotherham
Governance
- 05 April 1962: Standard registration
- 03 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1052600 FULL LIFE CHURCH (MALTBY)
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 523980 TOWNVILLE RECREATION AND SPORTS CLUB
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1076958 BLUEBELL WOOD CHILDREN'S HOSPICE
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 523474 ASKERN MINERS WELFARE HALL, SPORTS AND RECREATION ...
- 03 October 2024: Funds transferred to 700356 THE ROTHERHAM HOSPICE TRUST
- MALTBY MINERS WELFARE (Working name)
- MALTBY COLLIERY INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.71k | £36.69k | £1.26k | £768 | £272 | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.90k | £401.09k | £1.92k | £2.17k | £63.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2023 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2023 | 668 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2023 | 578 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MALTBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window