TICKHILL WITH STAINTON PARISH CLERK'S TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Doncaster
Governance
- 13 August 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL RICHARDSON | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Philip Richard Beavers | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
John Bernard George Marsden | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Joan Ruth Nathan | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
John Charles Michael Francis Bergin | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 MAR 2024 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (‘THE OBJECTS’): THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ASSISTING THE INCUMBENT OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TICKHILL ST. MARY WITH STAINTON ST. WINIFRID, IN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE (“ THE PARISH”) WITH THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL SUPPORT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANT FUNDING TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR ORGANISATIONS PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE PARISH, BUT IN ANY EVENT WITH AN ORDINARILY STRONG PARISH CONNECTION AS A PRACTICAL OUTWORKING OF THE FAITH IN THE COMMUNITY. THIS WILL INCLUDE: A) SUPPORTING THE INCUMBENT AND THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (PCC) IN PROMOTING AND DISCHARGING THEIR DUTIES IN RESPECT OF THE WHOLE SPECTRUM OF PARISH WORK, WHICH IS PASTORAL, EVANGELICAL, ECUMENICAL, SOCIAL AND CHARITABLE. B) PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP C) ENCOURAGING THE FURTHERANCE OF CIVIC, CULTURAL, AND SOCIAL AND RELIGIOUS COHESION PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE PARISH, BUT IN ANY EVENT ORDINARILY WITH A STRONG PARISH CONNECTION. TO ENCOURAGE SERVICE MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL WITHOUT FINANCIAL REWARD. D) SUPPORT CHILDREN WITHIN THE COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY IN THEIR EARLY YEARS, TO DEVELOP SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP INTO MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. E) ASSIST IN COMMUNITY AND RELIGIOUS LED INITIATIVES IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. F) OFFER HELP AND COMFORT TO MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, WHO ARE IN DISTRESS; AND. G) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE WHICH ARE ANCILLARY TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PHILIP RICHARD BEAVERS
41 SAFFRON CRESCENT
TICKHILL
DONCASTER
DN11 9RX
- Phone:
- 07717171954
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.