BREATHING SPACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A health and wellbeing charity based in and around St Michael's church, Witton Gilbert, for adults and children of all faiths and none, non-discriminatory, and utilizing the '5 Ways to Wellbeing' approach. A wide spectrum of guided activities is provided, including mindfulness, ecotherapy, art, walk and talk, folk singing, creative writing, walk for life, woodland conservation and forest school.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 03 April 2024: CIO registration
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 1148676 BREATHING SPACE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jayne Hillary | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noel Dixon | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dean | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Wilcox | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Peers | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denis Daggett | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1)TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH HEALTH PROBLEMS (INCLUDING ISSUES AROUND MENTAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING, AS RECOGNISED BY THE WORLD HEALTH ORGANISATION) IN WITTON GILBERT, SURROUNDING VILLAGES AND THE WIDER NORTH EAST REGION, BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO SPACE, SERVICES, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES IN AND AROUND THE CHURCH AND LAND OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, WITTON GILBERT AND OTHER LAND AND SPACES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY. 2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michael & All Angels
Coach Lane
Witton Gilbert
DURHAM
DH7 6SX
- Phone:
- 07508471522
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.