Financial history CAERWEDROS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.10k £4.24k £7.07k £14.83k £23.62k
Total expenditure £8.62k £5.59k £11.69k £10.46k £18.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A