Trustees GRESFORD & DISTRICT WAR MEMORIAL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 524052

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Ian Grey | Chair | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Philip Perry | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Mary Ellis | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Turner | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Griffin | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle DERosa | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carmello Gino Paletta | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Major Michael James | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Happs | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Margaret Osborne | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas Lloyd | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Louise Blackmore | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Lesley Anne Murley | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edwards | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GILBERT BELL | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Geoffrey JONES | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN THELMA WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JANE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ELIZABETH RENNER SHIELDS JP MA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.