AHMADIYYA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION UNITED KINGDOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be inserted
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2025
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 June 2024: Standard registration
- AHMADIYYA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SULTAN LONE | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Irfan Ahmed Quraishi | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Ibrahim Ikhlaf | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|||||
FAREED AHMAD | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|||||
RAFIQ AHMED HAYAT | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr MAQBOOL SANI SETHI | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Mansoor Ahmed Shah | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE AIMS AND OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 1.1 THE PROPAGATION OF ISLAM AS EXPOUNDED BY MIRZA GHULAM AHMAD OF QADIAN, THE FOUNDER OF THE AHMADIYYA MOVEMENT AND THE KHALIFATUL MASIH AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE THE COMPARATIVE STUDY OF RELIGION IN ANY OR ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD. 1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS THE MANAGING COMMITTEE OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 1.3 THE PROVISION, AS FAR AS POSSIBLE, OF MAINTENANCE OF INDIGENT PERSONS, ORPHANS AND WIDOWS AND FOR SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS ARE UNABLE BY REASON OF SOME PHYSICAL OR OTHER INFIRMITY OR HANDICAP TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN ANY OR ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ahmadiyya Muslim Association Uk
16 Gressenhall Road
LONDON
SW18 5QL
- Phone:
- 02088745836
- Email:
- enquiries@ahmadiyya.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.