Trustees OWAIN GLYNDWR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
Charity number: 524286

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Rostron | Chair | 02 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Edwards | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Gaskell | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Barneby | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fanson | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Delyth Ann Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Deborah Jane Jones | Trustee |
|
||||||
Arwyn Davies | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.