VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The hall is a community facility, offering a low rate venue for residents use. We are able to cater for both the able and less able, as we have disabled ramps and toilet facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £15,109
Total expenditure: £10,532

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penelope Kirkham Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Sally Bailey Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
Michael Burke Trustee 31 December 2019
MAGOR AND UNDY COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time
Dr Rosalie Sian King Trustee 31 December 2019
FRIENDS OF THE NEWPORT SHIP
Received: On time
SOUTH WALES RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
PAUL TURNER Trustee 31 December 2019
None on record
Sally RAGGETT Trustee 01 October 2019
MAGOR AND UNDY COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.91k £20.04k £15.78k £16.77k £15.11k
Total expenditure £5.99k £42.21k £11.90k £10.13k £10.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £12.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Undy Memorial Hall
Dinch Hill Lane
Undy
Monmouthshire
NP26 3EQ
Phone:
07496728152