THE BRADSHAW FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to advance education of the public in the cultural heritage and preservation of hominins by; the provision of digital and printed information resources detailing the inter-related realms of archaeology, anthropology, ethnology, genetics and the technology of scientific dating; providing grants to support research in the cultural heritage and preservation of hominins.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAMON PATRICK DE LASZLO | Chair | 25 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Howard Stanley Mighell ACA | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Deborah Birkbeck | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JUN 2024 AS AMENDED ON 31 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURAL HERITAGE AND PRESERVATION OF HOMININS BY; • THE PROVISION OF DIGITAL AND PRINTED INFORMATION RESOURCES DETAILING THE INTER-RELATED REALMS OF ARCHAEOLOGY, ANTHROPOLOGY, ETHNOLOGY, GENETICS AND THE TECHNOLOGY OF SCIENTIFIC DATING; • PROVIDING GRANTS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH IN THE CULTURAL HERITAGE AND PRESERVATION OF HOMININS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘HOMININS’ IS ‘THE GROUP CONSISTING OF MODERN HUMANS, EXTINCT HUMAN SPECIES AND ALL OUR IMMEDIATE ANCESTORS”
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ALBANY COURTYARD
LONDON
W1J 0HF
- Phone:
- 02074371982
- Email:
- damon@delaszlo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.