Financial history 1ST SHIPSTON-ON-STOUR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.81k £32.04k £19.94k £12.63k £17.32k
Total expenditure £24.76k £5.04k £10.57k £26.99k £15.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.64k £8.00k N/A N/A