1ST ROWLEY REGIS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the physical, mental and spiritual development of young people, so that they may take a constructive place in society. Open to all people from 4 years to 25 years old and are members of the world wide scouting organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sandwell
Governance
- 12 December 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lance Goodby | Chair | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Andrews | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Aaron Woodhall | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roseblade | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 469 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 834 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
ROWLEY REGIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Rowley Regis Scout Group
5a Hawes Lane
ROWLEY REGIS
West Midlands
B65 9AL
- Phone:
- 07305340214
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window