THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST BUCKROSE IN THE DIOCESE OF YORK

Charity number: 1210940
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PARISH OF WEST BUCKROSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Catherine Anne Turner Chair
None on record
David James Slack Trustee 25 April 2024
ROTHER VALLEY RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
North Yorkshire Moors Railway Trust
Received: On time
DAVID STEPHEN QUICK Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Louise Ann Hampson Trustee 17 October 2022
LEAVENING ALLOTMENTS & GARDENS
Received: On time
Pauline Durant Trustee 25 April 2016
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
The Hon James William Michael Willoughby Trustee 15 August 2005
THE WILLOUGHBY ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE MIDDLETON FUND
Received: On time
BURTON AGNES HALL PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: 2 days late
JANE SLANE SLOAN RAMSDEN Trustee 15 August 2005
SETTRINGTON ALL SAINTS CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
THE ARTS SOCIETY HELMSLEY
Received: On time
Lord Michael Charles James Middleton Trustee 15 August 2005
THE MIDDLETON FUND
Received: On time
Carol Evelyn Richardson Trustee
None on record
Ruth Madelaine Mattingly Trustee
None on record
Hon Ralph Daniel Beckett Trustee
None on record
Alison Margaret Dalby Trustee
None on record
Judith Mary Conn SRN HV(dip) Trustee
None on record
Jeremy William Thomas Durant Trustee
None on record
Carolyn Elizabeth Wilkinson Trustee
None on record
Linda Mary Illingworth Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
2, Sudnicton Croft
Westow, York
YO60 7NB
Phone:
01653619928