Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY CROSS, DAVENTRY IN THE DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH
Charity number: 1210926
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dawn Ann Stokes | Chair | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martin Noel Heath | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|||||
STUART PAUL HULME | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEVEN ROBINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev LESLEY SUZANNE TOMALIN | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WALLACE ROBINSON | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DONNA MARIE MILLS | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARY SMITH | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
EVA DOROTHY JANE LANE | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET SUSAN COLLINS | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK JOSEPH LANE | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DONKERLSEY | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH RACHEL HEATH | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Squire | Trustee | 14 May 2005 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ALLAN WARD | Trustee | 20 September 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.