Trustees HEENE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD
Charity number: 1210439
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel David Barden | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Caroline Margaret Grace Barden | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen David Jones | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Noel Anthony Atkins | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Joy Patricia Adams | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HENSHAW | Trustee | 13 August 2014 |
|
|||||
Angela Cameron Shaw | Trustee | 28 April 2008 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Anne Snook | Trustee | 01 May 1990 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.