STOCKTON, THORNABY AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £71,274
Total expenditure: £47,143

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1964: Standard registration
  • 15 November 2024: Funds received from 524693 1ST HARTBURN SEA SCOUT GROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STOCKTON DISTRICT SCOUTS (Working name)
  • STOCKTON, THORNABY AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Scott Chair 17 May 2019
CLEVELAND SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Niall James Bean Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Adam Alexander Bell Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
Antony Moody Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
FREDERICK ALAN ATKINSON Trustee 20 May 2016
None on record
MARGARET NORTH Trustee 02 August 2011
1ST FAIRFIELD SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
SHAUN JONES Trustee 30 July 2011
None on record
PAULINE HYAM Trustee
1ST EGGLESCLIFFE (ST JOHN'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £37.78k £52.96k £66.18k £85.43k £71.27k
Total expenditure £45.08k £21.45k £50.24k £59.44k £47.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £16.34k £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 Briardene Court
Stockton-on-Tees
TS19 8UX
Phone:
07562 262449