THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY COOKRIDGE

Charity number: 1210020
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 September 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY CHURCH COOKRIDGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul William Atkinson Chair 08 November 2017
KIRKE'S CHARITY
Received: 25 days late
Sally Ann Firth Trustee 23 March 2025
ST RAYMUND ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
THE INCORPORATED LEEDS CHURCH EXTENSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
Debra Jayne Allen Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Alan Michael Thorpe Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Dr Stewart James Prestwich Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Margaret Jennifer Workman Trustee 23 March 2025
None on record
Anna Louise Smithson-Brook Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Judith Elizabeth Hardy Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Patricia Swann Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Janet Bove Trustee 17 March 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Francisca Snowdon Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
Sara Louisa Nix Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
Patricia Louise Holden Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
Donald Snowdon Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
Dr John Richard Whitaker Trustee 18 March 2023
None on record
DAVID RICHARD SWANN Trustee 01 August 1970
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH
GREEN LANE
COOKRIDGE
LEEDS
LS16 7LP
Phone:
01132931210