Trustees AWL BRO PADARN LMA CIO
Charity Number: 1213238
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Paul QUANT | Chair | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
ROY WALFORD JONES | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Revd Canon Andrew Graham Loat | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth James | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
SYDNEY GEORGE SMITH | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|||||
DELYTH HOPKINS EVANS | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
CYNG GARETH DAVIES | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|||||
ELUNED RUTH ALISON SWANSON | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH DELYTH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Lynn Rees BA(Hons), MSc, MBA(HRM) | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nigel William Hardy | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anne Elizabeth Saunders MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Marie Powell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Olewicz | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Jenkins BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard Eynon Huws MLib (Wales) FLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ann Margaret Hopkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Heulwen Ann Barlow | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ruth Jenkins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dewi Evans | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Delyth Mair Morris-Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Meriel Ann Ralphs | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Valerie Hilda Norrington-Davies MSc PhD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Alan Jones BSc(Hons) | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.