THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST BOISIL, TWEEDMOUTH, IN THE DIOCESE OF NEWCASTLE

Charity number: 1210890
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TWEEDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Alastair Wilson MacPherson Chair 23 May 2021
None on record
Judith Jennings Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Dr Stuart Mackenzie Miller Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Barbara Donaldson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rosalind Margaret Richardson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Philip Francis Jennings Trustee 10 April 2022
None on record
Jennifer Linda MacPherson Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
KAREN LOUISE STRACHAN Trustee 29 April 2018
BERWICK YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
ANNE CATHERINE WADEY Trustee 22 March 2016
None on record
Anne Margaret McCreath Trustee 30 April 2012
None on record
Philip Mason Rowett Trustee 30 April 2008
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Culdees, 1 West End,
Tweedmouth,
Berwick-Upon-Tweed.
TD15 2HE
Phone:
01289309933