Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HENLEY-ON-THAMES, IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Charity Number: 1212097
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Samuel Brewster | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lane | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Wright | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Nystrom | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bruwer | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Chambers | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Simon Wright | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ryeland | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Abbie Nimmo | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Cowan | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cook | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Greenman | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jones | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Kotas | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev DUNCAN CARTER | Trustee | 26 November 1990 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.