THE ABERGAVENNY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF KING HENRY THE EIGHTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To financially assit students from King Henry VII School, Abergavenny who are going into further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 04 June 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART clifford ROGERS | Chair |
|
||||||
Bryony Nicholson | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Butler | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Rees | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Binmore | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sydney Gerald Cooper | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Malcom Clifford Lane | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Lewis | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID WOODHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN HICKMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.36k | £12.61k | £12.85k | £13.15k | £13.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £9.69k | £9.69k | £12.08k | £9.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 FEBRUARY 1965
Charitable objects
1. PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR THE ABERGAVENNY, KING HENRY VII COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL 2. THE BENEFIT OF THE PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF ABERGSVENNY OR WHO HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS PUPILS AT A SCHOOL IN THE SAID BOROUGH, AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ABERGAVENNY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wrens Nest
Llanvetherine
ABERGAVENNY
Gwent
NP7 8RG
- Phone:
- 07966117956
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window