THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF JOHN EDWARDS AND LORD HERBERT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to local School - The Montgomery Church in Wales School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Powys
Governance
- 21 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLLR DAVID RICHARD ERNEST JONES | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Cllr Wendy Christine Beaven | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Paulette Rose-Mary de Garis Gower | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
CLLR DAVID HAYDN ANDREW | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101 | £149 | £160 | £6.78k | £960 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £150 | £160 | £718 | £960 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 FEBRUARY 1968.
Charitable objects
1. PAYMENTS TO THE MANAGERS OF THE MONTGOMERY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER MAINTAINED PRIMARY SCHOOL IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, TO BE APPLIED IN PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL OR ITS PUPILS, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FROM PUBLIC FUNDS. 2. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES, I.E. PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF MONTGOMERY WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS).
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF MONTGOMERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Rowes Terrace
Pool Road
MONTGOMERY
SY15 6QD
- Phone:
- 01686 668790
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window