THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF JOHN SELLER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Schools, Youth Club, Scouts, organisations of an educational character in the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 05 December 1963: Standard registration
- JOHN SELLERS' TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stefan Collier | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SUE ROBSON | Trustee | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET PARKER | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|||||||
JANET BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/01/2020 | 02/01/2021 | 02/01/2022 | 02/01/2023 | 02/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £424 | £2.69k | £928 | £1.70k | £545 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £750 | £0 | £550 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 January 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 January 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29TH JUNE 1907
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF BOOKS OR FITTINGS FOR A SCHOOL LIBRARY, PRIZES FOR PROFICIENCY, EXHIBITIONS FOR EDUCATION HIGHER THAN ELEMENTARY, OR PAYMENT OF EDUCATIONAL FEES OR EQUIPMENT TO ENABLE YOUNG PERSONS TO ATTEND ANY EVENING SCHOOL, DAY OR EVENING CLASSES, OR COURSES OF INSTRUCTION. BOOKS OR FITTINGS FOR A SCHOOL LIBRARY, OR APPARATUS SUITABLE FOR OBSERVATION OR NATURE STUDY FOR THE USE OF SCHOLARS ATTENDING A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL OR EVENING SCHOOL OR PAST SCHOLARS OF ANY SUCH SCHOOL RESIDING IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA; PRIZES, EXHIBITIONS; FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE YOUNG PERSONS TO ATTEND EVENING SCHOOL, DAY OR EVENING CLASSES OR COURSES OF INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHRISTLETON OR LITTLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Little Mere
Christleton
CHESTER
CH3 7AA
- Phone:
- 01244335810
- Email:
- PAULINE@SPECACCOUNTING.CO.UK
- Website:
-
7.LittleMereChristletonCheshireCH37AA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window