THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S DOCKS WITH ST JOHN OF WAPPING IN THE DIOCESE OF LONDON

Charity Number: 1212555
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Parochial Church Council (PCC) is the elected governing body of St Peters London Docks. It works in partnership with the parish priest to support and promote the church mission in worship, pastoral care, and outreach within the local community.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2025: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE REVD JONATHAN WARWICK BESWICK SSC Chair 02 July 2018
THE SOCIETY OF MARY
Received: On time
PUSEY HOUSE CIO
Received: On time
JONATHAN WILLIAMS Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Kensah Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
MICHELLE GAY Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
NIKOLAOS SPYRIDIS Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Dr Duncan McAndrew Trustee 29 May 2023
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
DAVID JAMES GRANT WATSON Trustee
None on record
STUART MARTIN BATCHELOR Trustee
None on record
KELLY LISA HARDY Trustee
None on record
COLIN PEAT Trustee
None on record
HAZEL JOAN COPAS Trustee
None on record
ALLISON HUTTON Trustee
None on record
MARIT METTE HARGIE Trustee
None on record
Rev ANDREW GORDON BAILEY Trustee
None on record
Louie Gay Trustee
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
ST. PETERS CLERGY HOUSE
WAPPING LANE
LONDON
E1W 2RW
Phone:
02074812985