Trustees THE PCC OF HOLLINGTON ST JOHN WITH ST PETER & ST PAUL
Charity number: 1213251
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Tobias Joseph Lancaster | Chair | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CARLISLE LANE | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Thomas Redwin Collins | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Sally Ella Marchant | Trustee | 27 April 2012 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL BOYDE GLYNN | Trustee | 29 April 1966 |
|
|
||||
Angela Caroline Double | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Freda Close | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Frederick Mercer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Howard Frederick Moverly Greening | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Stephen Allen | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Clifford Green | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev Maureen Hinkley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Carol Green | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eric Norman Sumnall | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.