THE WINWICK EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support of four specific Church of England primary schools in north Warrington and small grants to further education students living in that same specific area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- St Helens
- Warrington
Governance
- 07 November 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY DOUGLAS MAINES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Laird | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Matthews | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jeanie Bell | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Seve Gomez-Aspron | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDITH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES DAVID BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £2.49k | £675 | £0 | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.95k | £1.37k | £0 | £3.00k | £428 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25TH OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
THE NET YEARLY INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE GOVERNORS IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION HAVING CHARITABLE OBJECTS DIRECTED TO EDUCATING OR IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF BENEFICIARIES BY DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES THROUGH THEIR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES; (B) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES. (BENEFICIAL AREA - ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF WINWICK, NEWTON ST PETER'S, NEWTON ALL SAINTS, EMMANUEL WARGRAVE, ST JOHN'S EARLESTOWN, LOWTON ST MARY'S AND LOWTON ST LUKE'S.)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forshaws Davies Ridgway Llp
17-21 Palmyra Square South
Warrington
WA1 1BW
- Phone:
- 01925230000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window