THE JEWISH SENIOR BOYS SCHOOL

Charity number: 526641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The trustees own a building which is currently leased to an Orthodox Jewish boys school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 1969: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 25 July 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YOEL ELIMELECH FRIEDMAN Trustee 02 July 2023
ATERES YOEL
Received: On time
KESSER CHARITIES LIMITED
Received: 41 days late
Chaim Weiss Trustee 02 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 June 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 March 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 April 2021 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
96 NORTHUMBERLAND STREET
SALFORD
M7 4DR
Phone:
01617925564
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available