Financial history NAZARENE THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE

Charity number: 526675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.58m £1.52m £1.50m £1.72m £1.64m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.34m £1.44m £1.68m £1.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.49k £57.60k N/A £18.39k £17.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £279.15k £293.25k £278.14k £365.17k £310.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.02m £1.01m £1.14m £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.76k £3.09k £2.83k £5.96k £14.06k
Income - Other £186.71k £195.02k £205.53k £213.01k £201.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.34m £1.44m £1.68m £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £471 £69 £2.69k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.21k £9.82k £17.58k £24.05k £12.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0