NAZARENE THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE

Charity number: 526675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of theological education in the HE sector

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 1970: Standard registration
  • 29 April 2025: Funds received from 1163648 MANCHESTER CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF CHRISTIANITY AN...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE BRITISH ISLES NAZARENE COLLEGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Iain McGookin Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Shirley Berry Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Rosemary Amanda Arnold-Knights Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Dr DEIRDRE BROWER LATZ Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Esther Elizabeth Newton Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Rev Antonie Holleman Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Dr Graham Greenlee Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
ANDREW MARK BOLTON Trustee 09 March 2024
MANCHESTER BROOKLANDS CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
Received: 1 day late
Kenneth George Jeffrey Baker Trustee 09 March 2024
None on record
HELEN JANE ROBERTS Trustee 10 March 2023
SHEFFIELD CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
Received: On time
Finlay Mackinnon Trustee 14 March 2022
None on record
Philip John Pleace Howard Trustee 21 November 2021
None on record
Rev Elsie Lorraine Bell Trustee 17 April 2021
None on record
Rev Arthur Snijders Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Rev Ruth Turner Trustee 07 June 2019
None on record
Rev Carl Ryan McCann Trustee 23 March 2019
CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE BRITISH ISLES SOUTH DISTRICT
Received: On time
STEVEN FRANCIS LEACH Trustee 20 March 2016
None on record
Ian Burleigh Trustee 15 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.58m £1.52m £1.50m £1.72m £1.64m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.34m £1.44m £1.68m £1.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.49k £57.60k N/A £18.39k £17.82k
Income - Donations and legacies £279.15k £293.25k £278.14k £365.17k £310.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.02m £1.01m £1.14m £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.76k £3.09k £2.83k £5.96k £14.06k
Income - Other £186.71k £195.02k £205.53k £213.01k £201.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.34m £1.44m £1.68m £1.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £471 £69 £2.69k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.21k £9.82k £17.58k £24.05k £12.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £1.97m £1.95m £1.93m £1.92m £1.98m
Long-term investments £120.23k £111.33k £161.04k £161.40k £162.48k
Other assets £927.64k £1.21m £1.35m £1.32m £1.19m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £304.59k £383.20k £441.41k £365.85k £288.98k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NAZARENE THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE
DENE ROAD
DIDSBURY
MANCHESTER
M20 2GU
Phone:
01614381926