Financial history ROSSALL SCHOOL

Charity Number: 526685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.41m £12.29m £15.52m £16.38m £18.78m
Total expenditure £12.19m £12.40m £15.34m £16.99m £19.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £991.79k £587.78k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £188.15k £25.62k £102.89k £88.37k £163.94k
Income - Other trading activities £189.51k £181.40k £371.42k £477.59k £527.24k
Income - Charitable activities £9.82m £11.28m £14.79m £15.53m £17.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £216.37k £217.07k £253.39k £285.83k £272.58k
Income - Other £991.79k £587.78k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.97m £12.24m £15.07m £16.61m £18.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £219.47k £164.44k £275.48k £377.68k £449.48k
Expenditure - Governance £32.79k £32.52k £40.07k £51.96k £43.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £598 £232 £0 £378 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0