Financial history SALISBURY HOUSE

Charity number: 526739
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.77k £29.68k £29.28k £31.34k £38.18k
Total expenditure £12.33k £23.32k £8.44k £25.04k £22.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A