SALISBURY HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity contributes to the maintenance of the buildings of Childwall CE Primary School and provides educational grants to current and former pupils out of investment income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 07 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS GEOFFREY PYE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Michael Andrew Doyle | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew Colmer | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
VIVIEN FLORENCE KERR | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Wendy Mason | Trustee | 16 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Louise Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Stuart Howard McClelland | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
DELIA OWEN | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
REV HUGH LEA-WILSON | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ALASTAIR EDWARD RAMSAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JONATHAN DAVID BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER LESLIE WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Jane Griffiths | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.77k | £29.68k | £29.28k | £31.34k | £38.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.33k | £23.32k | £8.44k | £25.04k | £22.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2025 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 March 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11TH SEPTEMBER 1964 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 3RD OCTOBER 1977 AND 2 SCHEMES DATED 21ST OCTOBER 1998 (SALISBURY HOUSE, TRUST FUNDS HELD ICW, AND PRIZE FUNDS HELD ICW)
Charitable objects
A) A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS B) SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A. C) EXHIBITIONS SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTIONS OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION. D) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO A FURTHER SHEME OF 3 OCT 77 TO ENTER ANY TRADE OR CALLING. E) SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE RADIUS OF 15 MILES FROM LIVERPOOL TOWN HALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 CHILDWALL PARK AVENUE
LIVERPOOL
L16 0JQ
- Phone:
- 01512377777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window