THE LOWTHER SCHOOL AND EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Training - helps with grant to maintain the school buildings.Provides grants to individuals going on to further education and vocational training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 September 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CHARLES BENSON | Chair |
|
||||||
LORD LONSDALE | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gordon | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHRISTOPHER STEELE ADDISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER ANDREW BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT LINDSAY GOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER HARRISON IVINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.82k | £31.32k | £25.97k | £40.63k | £41.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.13k | £17.75k | £31.50k | £17.81k | £18.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 18 OCTOBER 1909 AND 11 JANUARY 1961
Charitable objects
UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL. PROVISION OF EXHIBITION BURSARIES MAINTENANTS ALLOWANCES SCHOLARSHIP AND ALSO THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; EXTRA FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING.
Area of benefit
LOWTHER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Celleron House
Tirril
Penrith
CA10 2LS
- Phone:
- 07836610463
- Email:
- robert.benson@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window