Financial history EDUCATIONAL CHARITY OF ELIZABETH BYWORTH

Charity number: 527222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.83k £4.97k £5.20k £5.57k £5.65k
Total expenditure £4.47k £2.89k £5.06k £4.18k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A