SPALDING GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE GOVERNORS OF SPALDING GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Working name)
- THE QUEEN ELIZABETH ROYAL FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL SPALDING (Working name)
- SPALDING GRAMMAR SCHOOL (BOYS) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John David Bennett | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir John Hayes CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daran Cass Bland | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Faulkner | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Cunnington | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £803 | £1.32k | £629 | £579 | £2.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.64k | £2.51k | £7.66k | £2.24k | £4.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 April 2025 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14TH SEPTEMBER 1911 AS VARIED SCHEME 11TH NOVEMBER 1913, 10TH FEBRUARY 1922, 15TH SEPTEMBER 1933 AS AMENDED BY ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT DATED 8TH DECEMBER 1949. as amended on 24 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
UP KEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOL PREMISES KNOWN AS SPALDING GRAMMER SCHOOL (BOYS). PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, TRANING COLLEGE, NOT EXCEEDING FOUR YEARS, TO PUPILS WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICDT OF SPALDING
Linked charities
- 30 April 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPALDING GRAMMAR SCHOOL
PRIORY ROAD
SPALDING
PE11 2XH
- Phone:
- 01775765800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window