UPTON UPON SEVERN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing for any school at which girls attend and which is in or substantially serves the beneficial area (Parish of Upton upon Severn) such benefits of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority. Promoting the education and social and physical training of females under the age of 25 years who are resident in the beneficial area and who are in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 12 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine St Leger-Chambers | Chair | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rachel Foley | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Doreen Small | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Martin Allen | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Barry Unwin | Trustee | 11 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
BARBARA HINTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.59k | £2.84k | £2.76k | £2.64k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £4.68k | £1.37k | £1.97k | £2.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
A. IN PROVIDING FORANY SCHOOL AT WHICH GIRLS ATTEND AND WHICH IS IN OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVES THE BENEFICIAL AREA SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. B. IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSCAL TRINING OF FEMALES UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 27 OF ABOVE-MENTIONED SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF UPTON SEVERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Prices Lane
Upton-Upon-Severn
WORCESTER
WR8 0LY
- Phone:
- 01684 210617
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window