Financial history St James Dudley Foundation

Charity number: 527526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.70k £18.76k £20.03k £22.14k £22.26k
Total expenditure £2.28k £2.36k £3.19k £5.83k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A