DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL)

Charity number: 527987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education and training for children and young people, make grants to individuals. Income is derived from renting out 3 fields within the parish, plus family activities in the fields and nature walks.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,302
Total expenditure: £4,269

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BARN'S CHARITY DESFORD (Working name)
  • DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Gareth Hutchinson Chair 22 February 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT BARTHOLOMEW, KIRBY MUXLOE
Received: On time
Averil Brooker Trustee 26 October 2022
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Karen Margaret Osborne Trustee 17 December 2020
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Ceinwen Ann Tilley Trustee 17 December 2020
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Nicola Marie Lockley Trustee 17 November 2020
DESFORD IN BLOOM
Recently registered
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOE SCARRATT Trustee 07 August 2012
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PAT CRANE Trustee
DESFORD LIBRARY COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time
DESFORD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
DESFORD VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL (LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND)
Received: On time
DESFORD HERITAGE
Recently registered
DESFORD IN BLOOM
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.39k £2.75k £3.19k £3.10k £4.30k
Total expenditure £2.92k £3.05k £3.27k £3.78k £4.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 July 2024 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 4 NOVEMBER 1881 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 8 FEBRUARY 1907.
Charitable objects
APPRENTICING TO ANY SUITABLE TRADE OR OCCUPATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, ANY RESIDUE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS PAYMENTS FOR CONTINUANCE AT SCHOOL OR BY REWARDS OF PRIZES
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DESFORD
Registration history
  • 23 October 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
11 COTTAGE LANE
DESFORD
LEICESTER
LE9 9GF
Phone:
01455821725
Website:

No information available