ASKEW EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWARDING GRANTS TO YOUNG PEOPLE, AND ORGANISATIONS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE PARISH OF FORD AND ETAL IN NORTHUMBERLAND, TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 October 1975: Standard registration
- THE ASKEW TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Bruce Webster | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Bell | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charlotte Osborn | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hardy | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|||||
HON ANDREW HUGH JOICEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES WILLIAM MOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269 | £721 | £251 | £288 | £319 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £409 | £400 | £250 | £475 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 OCTOBER 1975
Charitable objects
1. A YEARLY SUM OF $25 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONRS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME TO BE PAID TO THE MANAGERS FOR THE TIME BEING OF FORD CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN DEFRAYING THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE BUILDINGS OF THE SAID SCHOOL. 2. THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF FORD WHO ARE IN NIDENT IN THE PARISH OF FORD OR ON THE CHURCH ELECTORAL ROLL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL, FORD WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Etal
CORNHILL-ON-TWEED
Northumberland
TD12 4TN
- Phone:
- 07769667201
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window