Financial history THE YARLET TRUST

Charity number: 528618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.48m £1.64m £1.91m £2.06m £3.02m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.68m £1.86m £2.01m £2.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £175.83k £983.75k
Income from government grants £102.53k £15.54k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.95k £5.40k £1.16k £1.16k £1.15k
Income - Other trading activities £5.98k £12.68k £9.28k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.61m £1.86m £1.88m £1.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.15k
Income - Investment £0 £1 £65 £948 £1.96k
Income - Other £112.05k £15.88k £45.78k £174.19k £1.11m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.65m £1.84m £2.00m £2.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.52k £25.76k £13.09k £16.36k £23.25k
Expenditure - Governance £36.41k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £15.64k £0 £0 £0 £0