Financial history THE QUAKER PEACE STUDIES TRUST

Charity number: 529095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £16.93k £12.46k £12.45k £13.54k £33.96k
Total expenditure £81.13k £47.38k £67.25k £78.32k £51.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A